VA HB1029 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Early retirement; constitutional officers. Provides that in certain circumstances a constitutional officer shall be eligible for the normal retirement allowance without requiring that such individual have 20 or more years of creditable service at the date of separation. The bill applies to a constitutional officer who (i) is involuntary separated from service because their office was lawfully abolished, as a result of their city reverting to town status, and (ii) is serving in such office at the time of reversion.
Title
Early retirement; constitutional officers.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103070D |