VA HB1028 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional officers; hiring notices. Allows constitutional officers to use the local government's official website and related social media platforms to advertise employment positions.
Title
Constitutional officers; hiring notices.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102245D |