VA HB1028 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate settlement; choice of settlement service provider. Provides that a purchaser or borrower in a transaction related to real estate in the Commonwealth shall have the right to select the settlement agent, mortgage lender or broker, and any other vendor associated with the financing or settlement of such real estate. Currently, such right is limited to the choice of settlement agent. The bill also prohibits the seller or any other party associated with a real estate transaction from requiring the use of, or offering anything of value for the use of, a particular mortgage lender or broker or any other vendor as a condition of the sale.
Title
Real estate settlement; choice of settlement service provider.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102638D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1028 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1028+hil |