VA HB1027 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Security freezes; fees. Reduces the maximum amount that a credit reporting agency may charge to place, remove, or lift a security freeze on a consumer's credit report from $10 to $5. This bill is identical to SB 16.
Title
Security freezes; fees for placing on a consumer's credit report.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] | Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Matthew James [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Sen. John McGuire [R] |
Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1027ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1027H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106440D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106440D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100594D |