VA HB1026 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - House: Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - House: Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; advertising "Happy Hour." Provides that nothing in ABC law or ABC Board regulations shall be construed to prohibit a retail on-premises licensee from advertising "Happy Hour" or "Drink Specials" and the time period during which alcoholic beverages are being sold at reduced prices using the Internet or similar forms of electronic communications media, provided the licensee complies with all other provisions of ABC law and Board regulations.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; advertising "Happy Hour."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | House: Incorporated by General Laws | |
2012-02-07 | House: Incorporated by General Laws | |
2012-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB470-Albo) by voice vote | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101271D |
Same As/Similar To
HB470 (Similar To) 2012-02-17 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1026 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1026+hil |