VA HB1023 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Custodial interrogations; recording. Provides that any law-enforcement officer shall, if practicable, make an audiovisual recording of the entirety of any custodial interrogation of a person conducted in a place of detention. The bill provides that if an audiovisual recording is unable to be made, the law-enforcement officer shall make an audio recording of the entirety of the custodial interrogation. The bill provides that the failure of a law-enforcement officer to make such a recording shall not affect the admissibility of the statements made during the custodial interrogation, but the court or jury may consider such failure in determining the weight given to such evidence. As introduced, the bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custodial interrogations; audiovisual recording.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1023ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference substitute printed 20109985D-H1
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-02SenateSenators: McClellan, Morrissey, McDougle
2020-03-02SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-28HouseDelegates: Adams, L.R., Watts, Carroll Foy
2020-02-28HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-28HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-27SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-27SenateSenate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
2020-02-25HouseSenate substitute with amendment rejected by House 20108202D-S1 (0-Y 100-N)
2020-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1023S1
2020-02-21SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-21SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108202D-S1
2020-02-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108202D-S1
2020-02-12SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-12SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-31HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HousePrinted as engrossed 20101713D-E
2020-01-30HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1023E
2020-01-30HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-30HouseRead second time
2020-01-29HouseRead first time
2020-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101713D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192390.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1023&201+sum+HB1023
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1023+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1023E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1023S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1023H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1023ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0031+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0071+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0281+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0311+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0375+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0771HB1023+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0801HB1023+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1329+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1140HB1023+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2121+HB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1863HB1023+HB1023

Bill Comments

feedback