VA HB1019 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; conveyance of easement and appurtenances thereto to telecommunications companies. Adds telecommunications companies to the list of entities to which a state department, agency, or institution may grant an easement.
Title
Telecommunications companies; conveyance of easement and appurtenances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 68 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1019ER) |
2022-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102657D |
Same As/Similar To
SB444 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
SB444 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
SB444 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)