VA HB1019 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Motor vehicle sales and use tax; definition of sale price; trade-in vehicles. Provides that for the purposes of calculating the motor vehicle sales and use tax for new vehicle purchases only, the sale price shall be reduced by the value of any trade-in vehicle. Under current law, no allowance or deduction is given for the value of a trade-in vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle sales and use tax; definition of sale price, trade-in vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Finance
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102996D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812401(n/a)See Bill Text
5812405(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback