VA HB1012 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0860)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0860)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Early childhood care and education; licensing. Requires the Board of Education to establish a statewide unified public-private system for early childhood care and education in the Commonwealth to be administered by the Board of Education, the Superintendent of Public Instruction, and the Department of Education. The bill transfers the authority to license and regulate child day programs and other early child care agencies from the Board of Social Services and Department of Social Services to the Board of Education and Department of Education. The bill maintains current licensure, background check, and other requirements of such programs. Such provisions of the bill have a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021. The bill requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish a plan for implementing the statewide unified early childhood care and education system and requires the Department of Social Services and the Department of Education to enter into a cooperative agreement to coordinate the transition. The bill also requires the Board of Education to establish, no later than July 1, 2021, a uniform quality rating and improvement system designed to provide parents and families with information about the quality and availability of certain publicly funded early childhood care and education providers and to publish the initial quality ratings under such system in the fall of 2023.
Title
Early childhood care and education; establishment of system, definitions, licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 11-N) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 11-N) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0860) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 860 (effective - see bill) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1012ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1012H2 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107715D-H2 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee on Education substitute rejected 20105824D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107715D-H2 |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105824D-H1 |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104557D |
Same As/Similar To
SB578 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0861)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2292 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2824 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 741 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 370.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 370.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 390 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1167 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 208.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 199.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.056 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 299.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.18:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1704.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1706.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1720.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1722 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1723 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1724 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1725 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1727 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1734 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1738 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1813 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1815 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 601.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |