VA HB1011 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Community College System; baccalaureate degrees. Authorizes the Virginia Community College System to establish programs and grant baccalaureate degrees in nursing, education, applied technology, and other high needs areas to be determined by the Virginia Community College System.
Title
Community College System; establish programs and grant baccalaureate degrees in nursing, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Education | |
2010-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102164D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1011 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1011+hil |