VA HB1010 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1010

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Rules (14-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal fiscal impact statements. Provides that no bill resulting in an increase in net periods of imprisonment or commitment shall be (i) reported from a standing committee of the House of Delegates or the Senate or (ii) passed by the House of Delegates or the Senate unless a fiscal impact statement for the current version of the bill has been prepared and is printed on the face of the bill or reported or passed as an amendment to such bill. Current law requires such fiscal impact statements to be prepared and the amount of the estimated appropriation reflected in the fiscal impact statement to be printed on the face of each bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal fiscal impact statement; bills resulting in a net increase of period of imprisonment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28SenateContinued to 2021 in Rules (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Rules
2020-02-19SenateRereferred from Judiciary (10-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-31HouseReferred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102687D

Same As/Similar To

HB1010 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Rules (14-Y 0-N)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback