VA HB1005 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0168)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; wine wholesaler; primary area of responsibility. Removes the provision that describes the "primary area of responsibility" of a wine wholesaler that enters into an agreement with a winery to sell its wine in a certain sales territory. The bill provides that its provisions shall not render valid the provision of any contract that was entered into prior to July 1, 2018, and that was void under the law in effect prior to July 1, 2018. This bill is identical to SB 174.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; wine wholesaler, primary area of responsibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0168)
2018-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 168 (effective - see bill)
2018-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
2018-02-23SenateSigned by President
2018-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1005ER)
2018-02-22HouseEnrolled
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateRead third time
2018-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 18102812D-E
2018-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1005E
2018-02-06HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-06HouseRead second time
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-01HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102812D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41404(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1005
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1005+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1005E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1005ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0168+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1103V0016+HB1005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0054+HB1005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0078+HB1005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0400+HB1005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0065+HB1005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0560HB1005+HB1005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0571HB1005+HB1005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0581HB1005+HB1005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0582HB1005+HB1005

Bill Comments

feedback