VA HB10 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Fees for resident concealed handgun permits. Eliminates the fees that may be charged for the processing of an application for or issuing of a resident concealed handgun permit, including any costs associated with the clerk's consultation with law-enforcement agencies.
Title
Resident concealed handgun permits; fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100793D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |