VA HB1 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0806)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Scholastic records; disclosure of directory information. Clarifies that student directory information may be publicly disclosed by a school if the school has given notice to the parent or eligible student of (i) the types of information that the school has designated as directory information; (ii) the right of the parent or eligible student to refuse the designation of any or all of the types of information about the student as directory information; and (iii) the period of time within which a parent or eligible student must notify the school in writing that he does not want any or all of the types of information about the student designated as directory information. The bill also provides, however, that no school shall disclose the address, phone number, or email address of a student pursuant to 34 C.F.R. ?§99.31(a)(11) or the Virginia Freedom of Information Act (?§2.2-3700 et seq.) unless the parent or eligible student has affirmatively consented in writing to such disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Scholastic records; prohibited access to directory information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (38-Y 61-N) (Y: 38 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0806)
2018-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 806 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1ER)
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled
2018-03-10SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2018-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
2018-03-10HousePassed by temporarily
2018-03-10HouseConference substitute printed 18108228D-H3
2018-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-02-27SenateSenators: Suetterlein, Newman, Lucas
2018-02-27SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-02-27HouseDelegates: Wilt, Peace, Bulova
2018-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-02-26HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-02-23SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-02-23SenateSenate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (38-Y 61-N)
2018-02-21HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107257D-S1 (38-Y 61-N)
2018-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N)
2018-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1S1
2018-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107257D-S1
2018-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-19SenateRead third time
2018-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107257D-S1
2018-02-15SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N)
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (62-Y 35-N)
2018-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB1H2
2018-02-06HouseSubstitute by Delegate Wilt agreed to 18106647D-H2
2018-02-06HouseCommittee substitute rejected 18105888D-H1
2018-02-06HouseRead second time
2018-02-06HouseFloor substitute printed 18106647D-H2 (Wilt)
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105888D-H1
2018-02-01HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-11-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100527D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223701(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.4(n/a)See Bill Text
221287(n/a)See Bill Text
221287.1(n/a)See Bill Text
231405(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1H3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0806+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1104V0041+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0087+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0417+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0236+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0539HB0001+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0544HB0001+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0902+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0663HB0001+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1214HB0001+HB0001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1568+HB0001

Bill Comments

feedback