VA HB1 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Unsolicited commercial electronic mail (spam); penalty. Narrows the scope of the existing spam statute to cover only those emails that constitute unsolicited commercial electronic mail (spam). Commercial electronic mail is defined in the bill as electronic mail, the primary purpose of which is the advertisement or promotion of a commercial product or service. Spam is defined as a subset of commercial mail that is unsolicited. The definition of spam excludes emails that are transmitted by a sender to a person with whom the sender has an existing business or personal relationship. Any person who (i) falsifies or forges the transmission or routing information of spam or (ii) knowingly sells, gives, or distributes software designed to facilitate the transmission of spam is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The penalty for sending spam rises to a Class 6 felony if the person sends a certain volume of spam in a given time period or generates a certain amount of revenue from a spam transmission. This bill corrects a constitutional infirmity identified in the ruling of the Virginia Supreme Court in Jaynes v. Commonwealth, 276 Va. 443 (2008). In its opinion the Supreme Court held that Virginia Code §18.2-152.3:1 (anti-spam statute) is unconstitutionally overbroad on its face because it prohibits the anonymous transmission of all unsolicited bulk emails, including those containing political, religious, or other speech protected by the First Amendment of the Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic mail, unsolicited commercial; narrows scope of spam statute, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
2010-04-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 489 (effective 7/1/10)
2010-03-13 Senate: Signed by President
2010-03-12 House: Signed by Speaker
2010-03-12 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1ER)
2010-03-12 House: Enrolled
2010-03-05 Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2010-03-05 Senate: Read third time
2010-03-04 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2010-03-03 Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
2010-03-01 Senate: Rereferred to Finance
2010-03-01 Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2010-02-24 Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
2010-02-17 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2010-02-17 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2010-02-16 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2010-02-16 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2010-02-15 House: Printed as engrossed 10100741D-EH1
2010-02-15 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1EH1
2010-02-15 House: Amendments by Delegate Loupassi agreed to
2010-02-15 House: Committee substitute agreed to 10100741D-H1
2010-02-15 House: Read second time
2010-02-12 House: Read first time
2010-02-10 House: Committee substitute printed 10100741D-H1
2010-02-10 House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2010-02-03 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
2010-01-28 House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2009-11-16 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2009-11-16 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100110D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182152.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182152.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1EH1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+CHAP0489+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H0801V0095+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H08V0153+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV0666+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+S03V0203+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+S05V0264+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0624HB0001+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0655HB0001+HB0001

Bill Comments

feedback