UT SR0004 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Rules Resolution - Amendments to Senate Rules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Rules Resolution - Amendments to Senate Rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13 Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-13SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-09SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-09SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-03-01 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-01 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-28 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-23SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-23SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-17SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-17SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-02-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-02-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
SR11101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR14101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR14102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR14201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR14202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR24106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR31101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR31102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR32509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR42201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR43101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR43104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR44101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR44301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR47102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
SR47104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/SR0004.html
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SR0004.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SR0004S01.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SR0004S02.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillenr/SR0004.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SR0004.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SR0004S01_ComparedWith_SR0004.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SR0004S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SR0004S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SR0004S02_ComparedWith_SR0004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27830
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27831
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1405&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1484&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback