UT SJR020 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Supporting Sanpete County Increasing the Number of Contract Beds At its Correctional Facilities
Title
Joint Resolution Supporting Sanpete County Increasing the Number of Contract Beds At its Correctional Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-17 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |