UT SJR016 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Facility Disclosure Joint Resolution
Title
Health Care Facility Disclosure Joint Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTHHS | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTHHS | |
2010-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTHHS | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-03-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |