UT SJR013 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Federal and State Roles in Criminal Justice
Title
Joint Resolution on Federal and State Roles in Criminal Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |