UT SJR011 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Athletic Foundation Resolution
Title
Utah Athletic Foundation Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-04 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-03 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2010-03-01 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-08 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |