UT SJR008S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SJR008
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Term of Appointed Lieutenant Governor
Title
Joint Resolution on Term of Appointed Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in HSTRUL |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTGOC |
2014-03-04 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-03-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-03-03 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTGOC |
2014-02-25 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTGOC |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-20 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-02-20 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SCON |
2014-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SCON |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSTGOP |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTGOP |
2014-02-12 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTGOP |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTGOP |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SJR008 (Replaces) 2014-02-14 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Subjects
Constitution
Executive Branch
Executive Department - Const. Art. VII
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
State Officers and Employees
Executive Branch
Executive Department - Const. Art. VII
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
State Officers and Employees