UT SJR008 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Amending Rules of Criminal Procedure on Appointment of Counsel
Title
Joint Resolution Amending Rules of Criminal Procedure on Appointment of Counsel
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] | Rep. Ryan Wilcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |