UT SJR006 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Promoting the 3rs Framework of Rights, Responsibility, and Respect in Classrooms
Title
Joint Resolution Promoting the 3rs Framework of Rights, Responsibility, and Respect in Classrooms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Education Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-08 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-08 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-28 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |