UT SJR001 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Reappointing John L. Fellows as General Counsel to the Utah Legislature
Title
Joint Resolution Reappointing John L. Fellows as General Counsel to the Utah Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-15 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-25 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-01-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-01-22 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-01-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-20 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-20 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-12-23 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Legislative Employees and Compensation
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Legislative Staff Offices
Resolutions
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Legislative Staff Offices
Resolutions