UT SJR001 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Supporting the Study of Water Banking in Utah

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Supporting the Study of Water Banking in Utah

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2019-03-22SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2019-03-22SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2019-03-22SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-02-14 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-02-14 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-02-13 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-02-13SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2019-02-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2019-02-13SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2019-02-13HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2019-02-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-06HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-05HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-02-05HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-02-05HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2019-02-05SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-01-31SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-01-31SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-30SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-30SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-01-25SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-11 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-12-28 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-12-28 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-12-27 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback