UT SJR001 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Escalante Heritage Hole-in-the-rock Center Joint Resolution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Escalante Heritage Hole-in-the-rock Center Joint Resolution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-27 Senate/ substituted in SSUB
2010-01-26 Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2010-01-21 Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SINTRO
2009-12-17 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC
2009-12-17 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2009-12-10 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2009-11-19 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback