UT SB5003 | 2020 | 5th Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Covid-19 Immunity Provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Covid-19 Immunity Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 44 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2020-06-23 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2020-06-23SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2020-06-22SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2020-06-22SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-06-19 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-06-19 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-06-18 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-06-18SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-06-18SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2020-06-18SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2020-06-18HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2020-06-18HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-06-18HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-06-18HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-06-18HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-06-18HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-06-18HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-06-18HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2020-06-18HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2020-06-18SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-06-18SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-06-18SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-06-18SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-06-17 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-06-16 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-06-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-06-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback