UT SB0319 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Technology Commercialization and Innovation Act
Title
Technology Commercialization and Innovation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-08 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO | |
2011-03-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-03-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |