UT SB0317 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Parks Access Highway
Title
State Parks Access Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSUB | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0317.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0317.pdf |