UT SB0301 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Transit Revisions
Title
Public Transit Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-08 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |