UT SB0296 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Performance Reporting and Efficiency Process Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Performance Reporting and Efficiency Process Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-09 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2023-03-09 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-03SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-03SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-03-02 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-02 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-01 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-01SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2023-03-01SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-01SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-02-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-02-28HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2023-02-28HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-02-27SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-02-24SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-02-24SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-24SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-02-24 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-02-24 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-02-24 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63J1902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63J1903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63J1904Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback