UT SB0296 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Tax Provisions
Title
Amendments to Tax Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-25 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-02-23 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in S2ND | |
2011-02-23 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-18 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |