UT SB0286 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School Products Requirements
Title
School Products Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - House/ failed (Y: 30 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |