UT SB0286 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Grandparents' Visitation Rights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grandparents' Visitation Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 House/ substituted in HSUB
2011-03-10 House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB
2011-03-03 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-03-02 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2011-03-02 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2011-03-01 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-02-28 Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC
2011-02-24 Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC
2011-02-24 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC
2011-02-22 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC
2011-02-18 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2011-02-18 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2011-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback