UT SB0272 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Funds Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funds Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-13 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2023-03-13SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-09SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-09SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-03-02 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-02 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-01 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-01SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2023-03-01SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-01SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-02-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-02-28HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2023-02-28HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-27SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-24SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-24SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-23SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-23SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-23SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-02-20 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-02-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2330103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
261011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2658101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2658102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B2308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35A3205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35A3206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39A8105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
442101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
442102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53F9205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A151501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A151502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A151601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A151602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A151801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A15403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63C9501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63C9502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63J1602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63M7303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
802502Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/SB0272.html
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0272.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0272S01.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0272S02.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillenr/SB0272.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0272.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0272S01_ComparedWith_SB0272.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0272S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0272S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0272S02_ComparedWith_SB0272.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=28020
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=28022
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1442&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1255&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback