UT SB0272 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Transportation Provisions
Title
Amendments to Transportation Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in S2ND | |
2010-02-24 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |