UT SB0264S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0264
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retention of Outside Counsel, Expert Witnesses, and Litigation Support Services
Title
Retention of Outside Counsel, Expert Witnesses, and Litigation Support Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House/ receded from House amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House/ receded from House amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-29 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ receded from House amendment in HSPKR |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments in HCLERK |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDSB |
2014-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ intent language in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0264 (Replaces) 2014-03-10 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB