UT SB0260 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Women in the Economy Commission Amendments
Title
Women in the Economy Commission Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Workforce Services
Economic Development
Governor's Office of Economic Opportunity
Workforce Services
Economic Development
Governor's Office of Economic Opportunity
Workforce Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35A | 11 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 11 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 11 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 11 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 11 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/SB0260.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/sbillint/SB0260.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/SB0260.fn.pdf |