UT SB0257 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor Vetoed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor Vetoed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parent Review of Instructional Materials and Curriculum
Title
Parent Review of Instructional Materials and Curriculum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Governor Vetoed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-21 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-14 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTREV |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTREV |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV |
2014-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTREV |
2014-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTREV |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |