UT SB0254 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Penalty for Well Drilling Without a License
Title
Penalty for Well Drilling Without a License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTNAE |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTNAE |
2013-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE |
2013-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTNAE |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-27 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |