UT SB0254 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Unfair Claim Settlement Practices
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Unfair Claim Settlement Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTBUS | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Comm - Held in SSTBUS | |
2010-03-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |