UT SB0253 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uninsured Motorist Identification Database Program Amendments
Title
Uninsured Motorist Identification Database Program Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Greiner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0253.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/sbillint/sb0253.pdf |