UT SB0252 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Redistricting Amendments
Title
Legislative Redistricting Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 20 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 20 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 20 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 20 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 20 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 20 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 20 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 20 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 20 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 2 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 7 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/SB0252.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/sbillint/SB0252.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/SB0252.fn.pdf |