UT SB0250 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Political Party Bylaws - United States Senators
Title
Political Party Bylaws - United States Senators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDU | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-24 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-24 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |