UT SB0247 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Property Tax Appeals Process Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Appeals Process Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-03HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-03-03HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-02HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-03-02HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-26 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5921004Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/SB0247.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0247.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0247S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0247.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0247.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0247S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0247S01_ComparedWith_SB0247.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0247S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0247S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0247S02_ComparedWith_SB0247S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0247S02.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20765
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20774
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1224&house=S

Bill Comments 750

feedback