UT SB0242 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic Development Incentives for Alternative Energy Projects
Title
Economic Development Incentives for Alternative Energy Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-09 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-02 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTWED | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTWED | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |