UT SB0241 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Autism Coverage Amendments
Title
Autism Coverage Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Health
Disabilities
Health
Health Care
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Mental Health
Mental Health Professionals
Disabilities
Health
Health Care
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Mental Health
Mental Health Professionals