UT SB0229S03 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0229S01
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0229S04
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0229S04
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adoption Act Amendments
Title
Adoption Act Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] | Rep. Brad Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-03-06 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in S2ND |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTJLC |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0229S01 (Replaces) 2014-03-07 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
SB0229S04 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
SB0229S04 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV