UT SB0227 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interlocal Energy Amendments
Title
Interlocal Energy Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Senate/ substituted in SSUB | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in S2ND | |
2010-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |