UT SB0226 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and Use Tax Amendments
Title
Sales and Use Tax Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Harper [R] | Rep. Brad Dee [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2013-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2013-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTREV |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-22 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |